04/14/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
04/07/2010 | File Number 339 | |||
04/07/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 236 | |||
04/07/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/23/2010 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/18/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |