04/28/2010 | House Calendar Number 448 | |||
04/28/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/28/2010 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | |||
04/28/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/28/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/14/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/14/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/14/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/18/2010 | File Number 74 | |||
03/18/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 75 | |||
03/12/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/03/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/22/2010 | Public Hearing 02/26 | |||
02/19/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |