|
05/19/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Public Act 10-70
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 524
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
File Number 575
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 398
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|