04/22/2010 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/22/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/22/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/22/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/23/2010 | File Number 87 | |||
03/23/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 95 | |||
03/16/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2010 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/22/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |