|
06/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Public Act 10-123
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
House Calendar Number 487
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4847
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
File Number 516
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 348
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|