04/22/2010 | House Calendar Number 409 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/21/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/21/2010 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/21/2010 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3299 | |||
03/29/2010 | File Number 167 | |||
03/29/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 124 | |||
03/29/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/12/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/05/2010 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
02/23/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |