04/14/2010 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
03/29/2010 | File Number 170 | |||
03/29/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 131 | |||
03/29/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/12/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2010 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/23/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |