04/07/2010 | File Number 342 | |||
04/07/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 229 | |||
04/07/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/23/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/17/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/23/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |