04/27/2010 | File Number 647 | |||
04/27/2010 | New File by Committee on Public Safety | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/10 5:00 PM | |||
04/20/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/20/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety | |||
04/08/2010 | File Number 391 | |||
04/08/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 260 | |||
04/01/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/25/2010 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |