03/24/2010 | File Number 111 | |||
03/24/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 99 | |||
03/24/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/24/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/25/2010 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |