04/27/2010 | File Number 648 | |||
04/27/2010 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/10 5:00 PM | |||
04/20/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/14/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/07/2010 | File Number 345 | |||
04/07/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 231 | |||
03/30/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/12/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/12/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/09/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services | |||
02/25/2010 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |