|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 506
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3693
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
File Number 347
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 237
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|