|
06/08/2010
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Public Act 10-125
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Reconsidered
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
House Calendar Number 449
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 3674
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4100
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
File Number 93
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 98
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|