|
06/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Public Act 10-101
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5365
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
House Calendar Number 492
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
File Number 174
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 128
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|