03/31/2010 | File Number 229 | |||
03/31/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 162 | |||
03/31/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/31/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |