04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/12/2010 | File Number 472 | |||
04/12/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 321 | |||
04/12/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/12/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/25/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/24/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs |