|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 511
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4652
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4509
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
File Number 351
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 223
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|