|
05/26/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Public Act 10-74
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 512
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
File Number 655
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
File Number 302
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 206
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|