04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/01/2010 | File Number 258 | |||
04/01/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 165 | |||
04/01/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/01/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/19/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/05/2010 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
03/03/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |