|
06/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Public Act 10-120
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
House Calendar Number 497
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4973
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
File Number 264
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 194
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/10
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|