|
05/05/2010
|
Bill Passed Temporary
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 515
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 3767
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4970
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5241
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
File Number 474
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 317
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|