04/28/2010 | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/27/2010 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/13/2010 | File Number 529 | |||
04/13/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 342 | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2010 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |||
03/05/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |