04/28/2010 | Motion Failed MF | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |||
04/12/2010 | File Number 477 | |||
04/12/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 325 | |||
04/12/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/12/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/24/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/08/2010 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
03/05/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |