06/08/2010 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/26/2010 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/24/2010 | Public Act 10-150 | |||
05/05/2010 | In Concurrence | |||
05/05/2010 | House Passed | |||
05/05/2010 | Rules Suspended | |||
05/05/2010 | House Calendar Number 527 | |||
05/05/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/05/2010 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |||
05/05/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/05/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/13/2010 | File Number 530 | |||
04/13/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 344 | |||
04/13/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/18/2010 | Public Hearing 03/22 | |||
03/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |