04/29/2010 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/29/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/29/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/20/2010 | File Number 601 | |||
04/20/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 431 | |||
04/13/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2010 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |