04/22/2010 | House Calendar Number 423 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/22/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/14/2010 | File Number 543 | |||
04/14/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 390 | |||
04/14/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/14/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/10 5:00 PM | |||
04/01/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/11/2010 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |