04/27/2010 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
04/07/2010 | File Number 355 | |||
04/07/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 224 | |||
03/30/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2010 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |