04/14/2010 | File Number 539 | |||
04/14/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 386 | |||
04/14/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/14/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/10 5:00 PM | |||
04/01/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/01/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/30/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/24/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
03/11/2010 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |