05/18/2010 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/17/2010 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/11/2010 | Special Act 10-1 | |||
05/01/2010 | In Concurrence | |||
05/01/2010 | House Passed | |||
04/27/2010 | House Calendar Number 435 | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2010 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | |||
04/27/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/27/2010 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 3858 | |||
04/27/2010 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 3843 | |||
04/13/2010 | File Number 519 | |||
04/13/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 339 | |||
04/13/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/18/2010 | Public Hearing 03/22 | |||
03/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |