04/28/2010 | House Calendar Number 450 | |||
04/28/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/28/2010 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | |||
04/28/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/28/2010 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
04/28/2010 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4387 | |||
04/15/2010 | File Number 580 | |||
04/15/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 402 | |||
04/15/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/15/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/29/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/29/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2010 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |