04/21/2010 | No New File by Committee on Banks | |||
04/21/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/21/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/14/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | |||
04/06/2010 | File Number 306 | |||
04/06/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 202 | |||
03/29/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/12/2010 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |