04/08/2010 | File Number 409 | |||
04/08/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 265 | |||
04/08/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/08/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/24/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2010 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/12/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |