07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-182 | |||
06/08/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
06/03/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 628 | |||
06/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
06/02/2011 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
06/02/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/05/2011 | File Number 374 | |||
04/05/2011 | House Calendar Number 222 | |||
04/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/01/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | |||
01/25/2011 | Drafted by Committee |