04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/13/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 512 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/05/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/04/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 170 | |||
03/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 107 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
01/27/2011 | Public Hearing 01/31 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | |||
01/25/2011 | Drafted by Committee |