03/31/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/30/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |||
02/22/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/19/2011 | Vote to Draft |