|
06/03/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Public Act 11-34
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
File Number 800
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 498
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5960
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
File Number 283
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
House Calendar Number 180
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/08
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|