03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/15/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
01/27/2011 | Public Hearing 01/31 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | |||
01/25/2011 | Drafted by Committee |