|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-185
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
File Number 777
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 480
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5329
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
File Number 172
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
House Calendar Number 109
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|