03/29/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/17/2011 | File Number 81 | |||
03/17/2011 | House Calendar Number 63 | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/02/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
02/01/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/18/2011 | Vote to Draft |