03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment | |||
03/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Environment | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | |||
02/23/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/15/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/03/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/20/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |