03/28/2011 | File Number 230 | |||
03/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 141 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/16/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
03/08/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/22/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/17 |