05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 399 | |||
04/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 244 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/21/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |||
03/16/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
03/04/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/07/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |