|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Public Act 11-90
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
File Number 822
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 536
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6257
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/19/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
File Number 470
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
House Calendar Number 266
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|