LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05331
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05331
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05331
Action History
02/17/2011
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
02/17/2011
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
02/16/2011
Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
01/31/2011
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
01/31/2011
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
01/28/2011
Change of Reference Appropriations
01/18/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development