|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Public Act 11-91
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 470
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
File Number 547
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
File Number 65
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
House Calendar Number 56
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|