05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/27/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 232 | |||
03/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 143 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
02/08/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/01/2011 | Vote to Draft |