|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-187
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
File Number 850
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 560
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6985
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
File Number 376
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 224
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/01/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|