04/12/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 400 | |||
04/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 245 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |||
03/15/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/15/2011 | Vote to Draft | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/25/2011 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |