03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |||
03/24/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services | |||
03/02/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
02/03/2011 | Vote to Draft |