03/21/2011 | File Number 96 | |||
03/21/2011 | House Calendar Number 73 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/21/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
01/31/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/26/2011 | Vote to Draft |